Senate | 02/14/2023 | Senate passed Sub A | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (02/14/2023) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (02/09/2023) | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/06/2023) | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Rules, Government Ethics and Oversight |