House | 06/06/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 06/02/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2023) | ||
House | 06/02/2023 | Referred to House Corporations | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | Senate passed Sub A | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/01/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2023) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |