House | 06/07/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/01/2023) | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | House passed Sub A | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (05/25/2023) | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
House | 05/15/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/16/2023) | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Referred to House Finance | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/28/2023) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2023) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |