Senate | 06/19/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | House passed in concurrence | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/08/2023) | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | ||
House | 06/02/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2023) | ||
House | 06/02/2023 | Referred to House Municipal Government & Housing | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/01/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/25/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/11/2023) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |