Senate | 03/22/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | House passed in concurrence | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (03/21/2023) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (03/16/2023) | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Referred to House Municipal Government & Housing | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/07/2023) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2023) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |