Senate | 05/10/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | House passed Sub A in concurrence | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (04/25/2023) | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/19/2023) | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Referred to House Municipal Government & Housing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Senate passed Sub A | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/30/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (03/28/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Meeting postponed (03/14/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |