Senate | 04/07/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | House passed in concurrence | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (04/04/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/30/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Meeting postponed (03/14/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |