LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Rhode Island RI
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S0257
Action History
RI
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0257
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0257
Action History
House
05/17/2023
Referred to House Municipal Government & Housing
Senate
05/16/2023
Senate read and passed
Senate
05/10/2023
Placed on Senate Calendar (05/16/2023)
Senate
05/09/2023
Committee recommends passage
Senate
05/05/2023
Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2023)
Senate
02/16/2023
Introduced, referred to Senate Finance