Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island Senate Bill S0259 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33
44
55 2023 -- S 0259
66 ========
77 LC000950
88 ========
99 S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND
1010 IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY
1111 JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023
1212 ____________
1313
1414 A N A C T
1515 RELATING TO TAXATION -- ESTATE AND TRANSFER TAXES--LIABILITY AND
1616 COMPUTATION
1717 Introduced By: Senators Paolino, Rogers, de la Cruz, F. Lombardi, Gallo, Picard,
1818 Pearson, and Tikoian
1919 Date Introduced: February 16, 2023
2020 Referred To: Senate Finance
2121
2222
2323 It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows:
2424 SECTION 1. Section 44-22-1.1 of the General Laws in Chapter 44-22 entitled "Estate and 1
2525 Transfer Taxes — Liability and Computation" is hereby amended to read as follows: 2
2626 44-22-1.1. Tax on net estate of decedent. 3
2727 (a)(1) For decedents whose death occurs on or after January 1, 1992, but prior to January 4
2828 1, 2002, a tax is imposed upon the transfer of the net estate of every resident or nonresident decedent 5
2929 as a tax upon the right to transfer. The tax is a sum equal to the maximum credit for state death 6
3030 taxes allowed by 26 U.S.C. § 2011. 7
3131 (2) For decedents whose death occurs on or after January 1, 2002, but prior to January 1, 8
3232 2010, a tax is imposed upon the transfer of the net estate of every resident or nonresident decedent 9
3333 as a tax upon the right to transfer. The tax is a sum equal to the maximum credit for state death 10
3434 taxes allowed by 26 U.S.C. § 2011 as it was in effect as of January 1, 2001; provided, however, 11
3535 that the tax shall be imposed only if the net taxable estate shall exceed six hundred seventy-five 12
3636 thousand dollars ($675,000). Any scheduled increase in the unified credit provided in 26 U.S.C. § 13
3737 2010 in effect on January 1, 2001, or thereafter, shall not apply. 14
3838 (3) For decedents whose death occurs on or after January 1, 2010, and prior to January 1, 15
3939 2015, a tax is imposed upon the transfer of the net estate of every resident or nonresident decedent 16
4040 as a tax upon the right to transfer. The tax is a sum equal to the maximum credit for state death 17
4141 taxes allowed by 26 U.S.C. § 2011 as it was in effect as of January 1, 2001; provided, however, 18
4242
4343
4444 LC000950 - Page 2 of 4
4545 that the tax shall be imposed only if the net taxable estate shall exceed eight hundred and fifty 1
4646 thousand dollars ($850,000); provided, further, beginning on January 1, 2011, and each January 1 2
4747 thereafter until January 1, 2015, said amount shall be adjusted by the percentage of increase in the 3
4848 Consumer Price Index for all Urban Consumers (CPI-U) as published by the United States 4
4949 Department of Labor Statistics determined as of September 30 of the prior calendar year; said 5
5050 adjustment shall be compounded annually and shall be rounded up to the nearest five dollar ($5.00) 6
5151 increment. Any scheduled increase in the unified credit provided in 26 U.S.C. § 2010 in effect on 7
5252 January 1, 2003, or thereafter, shall not apply. 8
5353 (4) For decedents whose death occurs on or after January 1, 2015, a tax is imposed upon 9
5454 the transfer of the net estate of every resident or nonresident decedent as a tax upon the right to 10
5555 transfer. The tax is a sum equal to the maximum credit for state death taxes allowed by 26 U.S.C. 11
5656 § 2011, as it was in effect as of January 1, 2001; provided, however, that a Rhode Island credit shall 12
5757 be allowed against any tax so determined in the amount of sixty-four thousand four hundred 13
5858 ($64,400). Any scheduled increase in the unified credit provided in 26 U.S.C. § 2010 in effect on 14
5959 January 1, 2003, or thereafter, shall not apply; provided, further, beginning on January 1, 2016, and 15
6060 each January 1 thereafter, said Rhode Island credit amount under this section shall be adjusted by 16
6161 the percentage of increase in the Consumer Price Index for all Urban Consumers (CPI-U) as 17
6262 published by the United States Department of Labor Statistics determined as of September 30 of 18
6363 the prior calendar year; said adjustment shall be compounded annually and shall be rounded up to 19
6464 the nearest five dollar ($5.00) increment. 20
6565 (5) For decedents whose death occurs on or after January 1, 2024, a tax is imposed upon 21
6666 the transfer of the net estate of every resident or nonresident decedent as a tax upon the right to 22
6767 transfer. The tax shall be imposed only if the net taxable estate shall exceed three million six 23
6868 hundred thousand dollars ($3,600,000); provided, further, beginning on January 1, 2025, and each 24
6969 January 1, thereafter, said amount shall be increased by one million dollars ($1,000,000). 25
7070 (b) If the decedent’s estate contains property having a tax situs not within the state, then 26
7171 the tax determined by this section is reduced to an amount determined by multiplying the tax by a 27
7272 fraction whose numerator is the gross estate excluding all property having a tax situs not within the 28
7373 state at the decedent’s death and whose denominator is the gross estate. In determining the fraction, 29
7474 no deductions are considered and the gross estate is not reduced by a mortgage or other 30
7575 indebtedness for which the decedent’s estate is not liable. 31
7676 (c)(1) The terms “gross taxable estate,” “federal gross estate” or “net taxable estate” used 32
7777 in this chapter or chapter 23 of this title has the same meaning as when used in a comparable context 33
7878 in the laws of the United States, unless a different meaning is clearly required by the provisions of 34
7979
8080
8181 LC000950 - Page 3 of 4
8282 this chapter or chapter 23 of this title. Any reference in this chapter or chapter 23 of this title to the 1
8383 Internal Revenue Code or other laws of the United States means the Internal Revenue Code of 2
8484 1954, 26 U.S.C. § 1 et seq. 3
8585 (2) For decedents whose death occurs on or after January 1, 2002, the terms “gross taxable 4
8686 estate” “federal gross estate” or “net taxable estate” used in this chapter or chapter 23 of this title 5
8787 has the same meaning as when used in a comparable context in the laws of the United States, unless 6
8888 a different meaning is clearly required by the provisions of this chapter or chapter 23 of this title. 7
8989 Any reference in this chapter or chapter 23 of this title to the Internal Revenue Code or other laws 8
9090 of the United States means the Internal Revenue Code of 1954, 26 U.S.C. § 1 et seq., as they were 9
9191 in effect as of January 1, 2001, unless otherwise provided. 10
9292 (d) All values are as finally determined for federal estate tax purposes. 11
9393 (e) Property has a tax situs within the state of Rhode Island: 12
9494 (1) If it is real estate or tangible personal property and has actual situs within the state of 13
9595 Rhode Island; or 14
9696 (2) If it is intangible personal property and the decedent was a resident. 15
9797 SECTION 2. This act shall take effect upon passage. 16
9898 ========
9999 LC000950
100100 ========
101101
102102
103103 LC000950 - Page 4 of 4
104104 EXPLANATION
105105 BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL
106106 OF
107107 A N A C T
108108 RELATING TO TAXATION -- ESTATE AND TRANSFER TAXES--LIABILITY AND
109109 COMPUTATION
110110 ***
111111 This act would increase the net taxable estate exemption to three million six hundred 1
112112 thousand dollars ($3,600,000) on January 1, 2024. This act would also increase the exemption by 2
113113 one million dollars ($1,000,000) on January 1 per year thereafter. 3
114114 This act would take effect upon passage. 4
115115 ========
116116 LC000950
117117 ========
118118