House | 05/03/2023 | Referred to House Health & Human Services | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/02/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Meeting postponed (04/18/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Scheduled for consideration | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2023) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |