Senate | 06/27/2023 | Effective without Governor's signature | ||
Senate | 06/19/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | House passed in concurrence | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/14/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/08/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Meeting postponed (03/14/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |