Senate | 06/20/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 06/16/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | House passed Sub A in concurrence | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/14/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Senate passed Sub A | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/08/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2023) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |