Senate | 06/24/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 06/19/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | House passed Sub A in concurrence | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Senate passed Sub A | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
Senate | 06/12/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Committee recommended indefinite postponement | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2023) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |