Senate | 06/22/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 06/19/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | House passed as amended in concurrence | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 06/02/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/11/2023) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |