Senate | 06/15/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 06/12/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/23/2023) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |