Senate | 06/14/2023 | Senate passed Sub A | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
Senate | 06/12/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2023) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |