House | 06/09/2023 | Referred to House State Government & Elections | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Senate passed Sub A | ||
Senate | 06/02/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/08/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/01/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2023) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |