LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Rhode Island RI
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S0409
Action History
RI
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0409
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0409
Action History
Senate
06/04/2023
Meeting postponed (06/06/2023)
Senate
06/02/2023
Scheduled for consideration
Senate
02/28/2023
Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Senate
02/24/2023
Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2023)
Senate
02/16/2023
Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary