Senate | 05/18/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | House passed in concurrence | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (05/16/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/09/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Meeting postponed (04/20/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |