House | 06/02/2023 | Referred to House Innovation, Internet, & Technology | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/01/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/25/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2023) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |