House | 06/22/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
House | 06/19/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Senate passed Sub B in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | House passed Sub B | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/14/2023) | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub B | ||
House | 06/12/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
House | 06/11/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2023) | ||
House | 06/11/2023 | Referred to House Labor | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/08/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/31/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2023) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |