House | 06/13/2023 | Meeting postponed (06/13/2023) | ||
House | 06/11/2023 | Committee transferred to House Finance | ||
House | 06/11/2023 | Scheduled for consideration | ||
House | 06/09/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/09/2023) | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Referred to House Special Legislation | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/16/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2023) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |