House | 06/27/2023 | Effective without Governor's signature | ||
House | 06/19/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/16/2023 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | House passed Sub A | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
House | 06/12/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2023) | ||
House | 06/09/2023 | Referred to House Municipal Government & Housing | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2023) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |