House | 06/09/2023 | Referred to House Labor | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/08/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/31/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2023) | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |