Senate | 05/11/2023 | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Committee recommended indefinite postponement | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/11/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |