House | 06/23/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
House | 06/19/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | House passed Sub A | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/14/2023) | ||
House | 06/12/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
House | 06/11/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
House | 06/10/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/12/2023) | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Referred to House Finance | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/25/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (04/04/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |