Senate | 05/23/2023 | Meeting postponed (05/23/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Scheduled for consideration | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Meeting postponed (03/14/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |