2023 -- S 0481 ======== LC001773 ======== S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 ____________ A N A C T RELATING TO EDUCATION -- THE PAUL W. CROWLEY RHODE ISLAND STUDENT INVESTMENT INITIATIVE Introduced By: Senators Zurier, Bell, Ciccone, Mack, Miller, and Quezada Date Introduced: March 07, 2023 Referred To: Senate Education It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows: SECTION 1. Section 16-7.1-5.1 of the General Laws in Chapter 16-7.1 entitled "The Paul 1 W. Crowley Rhode Island Student Investment Initiative [See Title 16 Chapter 97 — The Rhode 2 Island Board of Education Act]" is hereby amended to read as follows: 3 16-7.1-5.1. Intervention and support for the Providence public school district. 4 [Expires on July 1, 2024.] 5 (a) No later than September 1, 2022, and in order to assess the Providence school district 6 across multiple measures of district performance and student success, the commissioner shall 7 update the turnaround action plan released June 23, 2020 (the “turnaround plan”), to include 8 measurable annual goals including, but not limited to, the following: 9 (1) Student attendance and suspension rates; 10 (2) Student safety and discipline; 11 (3) Student promotion, graduation, and dropout rates; 12 (4) Student achievement on the Rhode Island comprehensive assessment system; 13 (5) Progress in areas of academic underperformance; 14 (6) Progress among subgroups of students, including low-income students, English 15 learners, and students receiving special education; 16 (7) Reduction of achievement gaps among different groups of students; 17 (8) Student acquisition and mastery of twenty-first century skills; 18 LC001773 - Page 2 of 5 (9) Development of college readiness, including at the elementary and middle school 1 levels; 2 (10) Parent and family engagement; 3 (11) Building a culture of academic success among students; 4 (12) Building a culture of student support and success among faculty and staff; 5 (13) Recruitment and retention of a qualified, diverse workforce; 6 (14) Staffing ratios and teacher vacancies; 7 (15) Health and safety of facilities; and 8 (16) Developmentally appropriate child assessments, if applicable. 9 (b) Effective March 1, 2023, and for the duration of the turnaround, the Providence school 10 board shall meet at least monthly, and more frequently if necessary, to provide public input of 11 district performance and implementation of turnaround strategies. The Providence school board 12 shall have, at a minimum, the following powers and duties: 13 (1) To review and advise the commissioner on and approve the appointment of senior 14 school district administrators, provided that the Providence school board shall not have the 15 authority to appoint senior school district administrators so long as the turnaround plan is in effect; 16 (2) To advise the commissioner on districtwide policy, provided that the Providence school 17 board shall not have the authority to establish districtwide policy so long as the turnaround plan is 18 in effect set district-wide policy; 19 (3) To review progress toward annual performance measures; 20 (4) To receive feedback from stakeholders on the implementation of the turnaround plan; 21 (5) To establish appropriate advisory committees as needed to provide guidance on the 22 implementation of the turnaround plan; and 23 (6) Any other duties delegated to the Providence school board by the commissioner or the 24 council on elementary and secondary education (the “council”). 25 (c)(1) The order of reconstitution and control, issued October 15, 2019, shall be authorized 26 for a period of not more than five (5) years from issuance. The commissioner and turnaround 27 superintendent may jointly develop additional components of the turnaround plan and shall jointly 28 develop annual goals for each component of the plan in a manner consistent with this section. The 29 superintendent shall be responsible for meeting the goals of the turnaround plan. 30 (2) The commissioner and superintendent shall provide a written report to the Providence 31 school board at a minimum, on a biannual basis to provide specific information about the progress 32 being made on the implementation of the district’s turnaround plan. One of the quarterly reports 33 shall include progress toward annual measures, pursuant to this section. 34 LC001773 - Page 3 of 5 (3) The commissioner shall evaluate the performance of the superintendent on not less than 1 an annual basis. The purpose of such evaluation shall be to assess the implementation of the 2 turnaround plan and determine whether the district has met the annual goals contained in the 3 turnaround plan. The evaluation shall be in writing and submitted to the council and the Providence 4 school board no later than July 1 for the preceding school year. 5 (4) If the commissioner determines that the district has met the annual performance goals 6 stated in the turnaround plan, the evaluation shall be considered sufficient and the implementation 7 of the turnaround plan shall continue. 8 (5) If the commissioner determines that the superintendent has not met one or more goals 9 in the plan and the failure to meet the goals may be corrected through reasonable modification of 10 the plan, the commissioner, after consultation with the Providence school board and with the 11 approval of the council, may amend the turnaround plan. 12 (6) If the commissioner determines that the superintendent has substantially failed to meet 13 multiple goals in the turnaround plan, the commissioner may terminate such superintendent. 14 (d)(1) The council shall adopt regulations providing for: 15 (i) The end of turnaround status; and 16 (ii) The transfer of the operation of a school district from the Rhode Island department of 17 elementary and secondary education to the school committee and municipal control. 18 (2) The regulations shall include provisions to allow a district to retain measures adopted 19 in a turnaround plan for a transitional period if, in the judgment of the commissioner, the measures 20 would contribute to the continued improvement of the district. Such regulations shall also include 21 provisions that clearly identify the conditions under which such a transitional period shall end and 22 the powers granted to the commissioner and council under this section shall cease to apply to the 23 district. 24 (e) If, on the basis of the regulations adopted by the council pursuant to subsection (d) of 25 this section, the Providence school district has not improved sufficiently to remove the district from 26 turnaround status, the commissioner may, after consultation with the Providence school board and 27 with the approval of the council: 28 (1) Determine subsequent annual goals for each component of the turnaround plan with the 29 turnaround superintendent, and renew the turnaround plan for an additional period of not more than 30 three (3) years; and 31 (2) Create a new turnaround plan, consistent with the requirements of this section. 32 SECTION 2. Notwithstanding any provisions of P.L. 2022, ch. 263, §2, or of P.L. 2022, 33 ch. 264, §2, to the contrary, the provisions of §16-7.1-5.1 as amended by this Act in Section 1 shall 34 LC001773 - Page 4 of 5 remain in effect for the duration of the state’s takeover of the Providence public schools. 1 SECTION 3. This act shall take effect upon passage. 2 ======== LC001773 ======== LC001773 - Page 5 of 5 EXPLANATION BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL OF A N A C T RELATING TO EDUCATION -- THE PAUL W. CROWLEY RHODE ISLAND STUDENT INVESTMENT INITIATIVE *** This act would amend the provisions governing intervention and support for the Providence 1 public school district. The act would provide that the Providence school committee would review 2 and approve the appointment of senior school district administrators, and would also provide that 3 the amended provisions of §16-7.1-5.1 of the General Laws would remain in effect for the duration 4 of the State’s takeover of the Providence Public Schools. 5 This act would take effect upon passage. 6 ======== LC001773 ========