House | 06/14/2023 | Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Senate passed Sub A | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
Senate | 06/02/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |