House | 04/05/2023 | Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Senate passed Sub A | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/04/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (03/29/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |