House | 06/09/2023 | Referred to House Judiciary | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Senate passed Sub A | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
Senate | 06/02/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 05/13/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |