House
|
06/22/2023
|
Signed by Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2023
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2023)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Senate passed Sub A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2023)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Committee recommends passage of Sub A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Proposed Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Scheduled for consideration (06/08/2023)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Committee recommended indefinite postponement
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Scheduled for consideration (06/01/2023)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Senate voted to recommit to Senate Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Placed on Senate Calendar (05/30/2023)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Committee recommends passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2023)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Committee recommended measure be held for further study
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2023)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services
|
|
|