House | 06/02/2023 | Referred to House Health & Human Services | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | Senate passed Sub A | ||
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/01/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/25/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Meeting postponed (05/23/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Scheduled for consideration | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Committee recommended indefinite postponement | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |