Senate | 06/20/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 06/19/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | House passed in concurrence | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/14/2023) | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | ||
House | 06/12/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 06/11/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2023) | ||
House | 06/09/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/12/2023) | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Referred to House Judiciary | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/06/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/30/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |