2023 -- S 0660 ======== LC002119 ======== S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 ____________ A N A C T RELATING TO PUBLIC PROPERTY AND WORKS -- STATE PURCHASES Introduced By: Senators Euer, DiMario, Ruggerio, Lawson, F. Lombardi, Murray, Lauria, Quezada, Burke, and Cano Date Introduced: March 07, 2023 Referred To: Senate Labor It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows: SECTION 1. Chapter 37-2 of the General Laws entitled "State Purchases" is hereby 1 amended by adding thereto the following section: 2 37-2-82. Utilization of North American Contractor Certification companies. 3 (a) All public works renovation projects that exceed an aggregate amount of one million 4 dollars ($1,000,000), and all new construction projects that exceed an aggregate amount of five 5 million dollars ($5,000,000), that include glazing work, shall have glazing work performed by 6 North American Contractor Certification ("NACC") certified companies and initially, on and after 7 July 1, 2024, shall have one architectural glass and metal technician ("AGMT") certified worker 8 employed by the company or contractor. On and after January 1, 2025, each crew performing work 9 that meets the criteria of this section shall have one AGMT certified worker on site. On and after 10 January 1, 2026, for each crew performing work that meets the criteria of this section, twenty-five 11 percent (25%) of that crew shall be comprised of AGMT certified individuals on site. On and after 12 January 1, 2027, for each crew performing work that meets the criteria of the section, fifty percent 13 (50%) of that crew shall be comprised of AGMT certified individuals on site. 14 (b) As used herein, the term "glazing work" includes, but is not limited to, replacement and 15 installation of windows, curtain walls, interior glass partitions, glass handrails, aluminum 16 entrances, skylights, store fronts, and general installation of architectural glass and metal. 17 LC002119 - Page 2 of 3 SECTION 2. This act shall take effect on July 1, 2023. 1 ======== LC002119 ======== LC002119 - Page 3 of 3 EXPLANATION BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL OF A N A C T RELATING TO PUBLIC PROPERTY AND WORKS -- STATE PURCHASES *** This act would provide that certain public works renovation projects that include glazing 1 work would have the glazing work performed by North American Contractor Certification certified 2 companies. The act would also provide that crews on such projects would include a number of 3 architectural glass and metal technician-certified workers within those work crews. 4 This act would take effect on July 1, 2023 5 ======== LC002119 ========