1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | 2023 -- S 0660 |
---|
6 | 6 | | ======== |
---|
7 | 7 | | LC002119 |
---|
8 | 8 | | ======== |
---|
9 | 9 | | S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND |
---|
10 | 10 | | IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY |
---|
11 | 11 | | JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 |
---|
12 | 12 | | ____________ |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | A N A C T |
---|
15 | 15 | | RELATING TO PUBLIC PROPERTY AND WORKS -- STATE PURCHASES |
---|
16 | 16 | | Introduced By: Senators Euer, DiMario, Ruggerio, Lawson, F. Lombardi, Murray, |
---|
17 | 17 | | Lauria, Quezada, Burke, and Cano |
---|
18 | 18 | | Date Introduced: March 07, 2023 |
---|
19 | 19 | | Referred To: Senate Labor |
---|
20 | 20 | | |
---|
21 | 21 | | |
---|
22 | 22 | | It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows: |
---|
23 | 23 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 37-2 of the General Laws entitled "State Purchases" is hereby 1 |
---|
24 | 24 | | amended by adding thereto the following section: 2 |
---|
25 | 25 | | 37-2-82. Utilization of North American Contractor Certification companies. 3 |
---|
26 | 26 | | (a) All public works renovation projects that exceed an aggregate amount of one million 4 |
---|
27 | 27 | | dollars ($1,000,000), and all new construction projects that exceed an aggregate amount of five 5 |
---|
28 | 28 | | million dollars ($5,000,000), that include glazing work, shall have glazing work performed by 6 |
---|
29 | 29 | | North American Contractor Certification ("NACC") certified companies and initially, on and after 7 |
---|
30 | 30 | | July 1, 2024, shall have one architectural glass and metal technician ("AGMT") certified worker 8 |
---|
31 | 31 | | employed by the company or contractor. On and after January 1, 2025, each crew performing work 9 |
---|
32 | 32 | | that meets the criteria of this section shall have one AGMT certified worker on site. On and after 10 |
---|
33 | 33 | | January 1, 2026, for each crew performing work that meets the criteria of this section, twenty-five 11 |
---|
34 | 34 | | percent (25%) of that crew shall be comprised of AGMT certified individuals on site. On and after 12 |
---|
35 | 35 | | January 1, 2027, for each crew performing work that meets the criteria of the section, fifty percent 13 |
---|
36 | 36 | | (50%) of that crew shall be comprised of AGMT certified individuals on site. 14 |
---|
37 | 37 | | (b) As used herein, the term "glazing work" includes, but is not limited to, replacement and 15 |
---|
38 | 38 | | installation of windows, curtain walls, interior glass partitions, glass handrails, aluminum 16 |
---|
39 | 39 | | entrances, skylights, store fronts, and general installation of architectural glass and metal. 17 |
---|
40 | 40 | | |
---|
41 | 41 | | |
---|
42 | 42 | | LC002119 - Page 2 of 3 |
---|
43 | 43 | | SECTION 2. This act shall take effect on July 1, 2023. 1 |
---|
44 | 44 | | ======== |
---|
45 | 45 | | LC002119 |
---|
46 | 46 | | ======== |
---|
47 | 47 | | |
---|
48 | 48 | | |
---|
49 | 49 | | LC002119 - Page 3 of 3 |
---|
50 | 50 | | EXPLANATION |
---|
51 | 51 | | BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL |
---|
52 | 52 | | OF |
---|
53 | 53 | | A N A C T |
---|
54 | 54 | | RELATING TO PUBLIC PROPERTY AND WORKS -- STATE PURCHASES |
---|
55 | 55 | | *** |
---|
56 | 56 | | This act would provide that certain public works renovation projects that include glazing 1 |
---|
57 | 57 | | work would have the glazing work performed by North American Contractor Certification certified 2 |
---|
58 | 58 | | companies. The act would also provide that crews on such projects would include a number of 3 |
---|
59 | 59 | | architectural glass and metal technician-certified workers within those work crews. 4 |
---|
60 | 60 | | This act would take effect on July 1, 2023 5 |
---|
61 | 61 | | ======== |
---|
62 | 62 | | LC002119 |
---|
63 | 63 | | ======== |
---|
64 | 64 | | |
---|