Senate | 06/27/2023 | Effective without Governor's signature | ||
Senate | 06/19/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | House passed in concurrence | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | ||
House | 06/12/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2023) | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Referred to House Municipal Government & Housing | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/04/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (03/29/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |