LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Rhode Island RI
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S0674
Action History
RI
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0674
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0674
Action History
Senate
06/08/2023
Senate passed Sub A
Senate
06/06/2023
Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2023)
Senate
06/06/2023
Committee recommends passage of Sub A
Senate
06/05/2023
Proposed Substitute
Senate
06/02/2023
Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2023)
Senate
03/07/2023
Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs