Senate | 03/30/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | House passed in concurrence | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (03/29/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/28/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |