House | 05/31/2023 | Referred to House Health & Human Services | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/30/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |