House | 06/22/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
House | 06/19/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) | ||
House | 06/09/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/13/2023) | ||
House | 06/02/2023 | Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | Senate passed Sub A | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/01/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/25/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/19/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |