Senate | 06/12/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | House passed Sub A in concurrence | ||
House | 06/02/2023 | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/06/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | Senate passed Sub A | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/30/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Meeting postponed (04/20/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |