House | 06/14/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Senate passed Sub B in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2023) | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | House passed Sub B | ||
House | 06/02/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/06/2023) | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub B | ||
House | 05/26/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/01/2023) | ||
House | 05/26/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Referred to House Health & Human Services | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Senate passed Sub A | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/09/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Meeting postponed (04/20/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |