House | 06/09/2023 | Referred to House Education | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |