Senate | 06/22/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 06/19/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 06/12/2023 | House passed in concurrence | ||
House | 06/09/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2023) | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/08/2023) | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Referred to House Corporations | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/04/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (04/26/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |