LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Rhode Island RI
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S0773
Action History
RI
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0773
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0773
Action History
House
06/02/2023
Referred to House Finance
Senate
06/01/2023
Senate read and passed
Senate
05/26/2023
Placed on Senate Calendar (06/01/2023)
Senate
05/25/2023
Committee recommends passage
Senate
05/19/2023
Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/25/2023)
Senate
03/23/2023
Introduced, referred to Senate Finance