Rhode Island 2023 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island Senate Bill S0777 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/23/2023

                     
 
 
 
2023 -- S 0777 
======== 
LC002586 
======== 
S TATE  OF RHODE IS LAND 
IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY 
JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 
____________ 
 
S E N A T E   R E S O L U T I O N 
REINSTATING THE LIFE OF AND EXTENDING THE REPORTING AND EXPIRATION 
DATES OF THE SPECIAL LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO ANALYZE AND MA KE 
RECOMMENDATIONS REGA RDING TAX EXEMPT PROPERTIES IN THE STATE OF 
RHODE ISLAND 
Introduced By: Senators Ciccone, Ruggerio, and Pearson 
Date Introduced: March 23, 2023 
Referred To: Senate Finance 
 
 
RESOLVED, That the special legislative commission created by Resolution No. 352 1 
passed by the Senate at its January session, A.D. 2021, and approved July 1, 2021, entitled 2 
“SENATE RESOLUTION CREATING A SPECIAL LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO 3 
ANALYZE AND MAKE RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING TAX EXEMPT 4 
PROPERTIES IN THE STATE OF RHODE ISLAND” is hereby reinstated and the same 5 
members are hereby reappointed, and it is authorized to continue its study and make a report to 6 
the Senate on or before July 1, 2023, and said commission shall expire on August 31, 2023; and 7 
be it further 8 
RESOLVED, That the time for reporting and date of expiration authorized by resolution 9 
No. 352, passed by the Senate at its January session, A.D. 2021, and approved July 1, 2021, be 10 
and the same is hereby rescinded. 11 
======== 
LC002586 
========  
 
 
LC002586 - Page 2 of 2 
EXPLANATION 
BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL 
OF 
S E N A T E   R E S O L U T I O N 
REINSTATING THE LIFE OF AND EXTENDING THE REPORTING AND EXPIRATION 
DATES OF THE SPECIAL LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO ANALYZE AND MAKE 
RECOMMENDATIONS REGA RDING TAX EXEMPT PROPERTIES IN THE STATE OF 
RHODE ISLAND 
***
This resolution would reinstate the life and extend the reporting and expiration dates of 1 
the Special Legislative Commission to analyze and make recommendations regarding tax exempt 2 
properties in the State of Rhode Island from April 1, 2022, to July 1, 2023, and said commission 3 
would expire on August 31, 2023. 4 
======== 
LC002586 
========