1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | 2023 -- S 0777 |
---|
6 | 6 | | ======== |
---|
7 | 7 | | LC002586 |
---|
8 | 8 | | ======== |
---|
9 | 9 | | S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND |
---|
10 | 10 | | IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY |
---|
11 | 11 | | JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 |
---|
12 | 12 | | ____________ |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | S E N A T E R E S O L U T I O N |
---|
15 | 15 | | REINSTATING THE LIFE OF AND EXTENDING THE REPORTING AND EXPIRATION |
---|
16 | 16 | | DATES OF THE SPECIAL LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO ANALYZE AND MA KE |
---|
17 | 17 | | RECOMMENDATIONS REGA RDING TAX EXEMPT PROPERTIES IN THE STATE OF |
---|
18 | 18 | | RHODE ISLAND |
---|
19 | 19 | | Introduced By: Senators Ciccone, Ruggerio, and Pearson |
---|
20 | 20 | | Date Introduced: March 23, 2023 |
---|
21 | 21 | | Referred To: Senate Finance |
---|
22 | 22 | | |
---|
23 | 23 | | |
---|
24 | 24 | | RESOLVED, That the special legislative commission created by Resolution No. 352 1 |
---|
25 | 25 | | passed by the Senate at its January session, A.D. 2021, and approved July 1, 2021, entitled 2 |
---|
26 | 26 | | “SENATE RESOLUTION CREATING A SPECIAL LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO 3 |
---|
27 | 27 | | ANALYZE AND MAKE RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING TAX EXEMPT 4 |
---|
28 | 28 | | PROPERTIES IN THE STATE OF RHODE ISLAND” is hereby reinstated and the same 5 |
---|
29 | 29 | | members are hereby reappointed, and it is authorized to continue its study and make a report to 6 |
---|
30 | 30 | | the Senate on or before July 1, 2023, and said commission shall expire on August 31, 2023; and 7 |
---|
31 | 31 | | be it further 8 |
---|
32 | 32 | | RESOLVED, That the time for reporting and date of expiration authorized by resolution 9 |
---|
33 | 33 | | No. 352, passed by the Senate at its January session, A.D. 2021, and approved July 1, 2021, be 10 |
---|
34 | 34 | | and the same is hereby rescinded. 11 |
---|
35 | 35 | | ======== |
---|
36 | 36 | | LC002586 |
---|
37 | 37 | | ======== |
---|
38 | 38 | | |
---|
39 | 39 | | |
---|
40 | 40 | | LC002586 - Page 2 of 2 |
---|
41 | 41 | | EXPLANATION |
---|
42 | 42 | | BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL |
---|
43 | 43 | | OF |
---|
44 | 44 | | S E N A T E R E S O L U T I O N |
---|
45 | 45 | | REINSTATING THE LIFE OF AND EXTENDING THE REPORTING AND EXPIRATION |
---|
46 | 46 | | DATES OF THE SPECIAL LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO ANALYZE AND MAKE |
---|
47 | 47 | | RECOMMENDATIONS REGA RDING TAX EXEMPT PROPERTIES IN THE STATE OF |
---|
48 | 48 | | RHODE ISLAND |
---|
49 | 49 | | *** |
---|
50 | 50 | | This resolution would reinstate the life and extend the reporting and expiration dates of 1 |
---|
51 | 51 | | the Special Legislative Commission to analyze and make recommendations regarding tax exempt 2 |
---|
52 | 52 | | properties in the State of Rhode Island from April 1, 2022, to July 1, 2023, and said commission 3 |
---|
53 | 53 | | would expire on August 31, 2023. 4 |
---|
54 | 54 | | ======== |
---|
55 | 55 | | LC002586 |
---|
56 | 56 | | ======== |
---|
57 | 57 | | |
---|