Senate | 04/27/2023 | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Committee recommended indefinite postponement | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Meeting postponed (04/20/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |