Senate | 05/15/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | House passed in concurrence | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (05/09/2023) | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2023) | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Referred to House Special Legislation | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/04/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |